EP0334851 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MOLDED ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [1992/39] |
Former [1989/40] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Law Department(F.M. Leather) P.O. Box 2245-R Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TWILLEY, Ian, Charles 12625 Merry Drive Chester, VA 23831 / US | 02 /
FARLEY, Radcliffe, Wilcox Berks Road Worcester, PA 19490 / US | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Turner, Alan Reginald c/o Bendix Limited Douglas Road Kingswood, Bristol BS15 2NL / GB | [1994/01] |
Former [1989/40] | Turner, Alan Reginald BENDIX LIMITED Douglas Road Kingswood, Bristol BS15 2NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87907172.8 | 24.09.1987 | [1989/40] | WO1987US02438 | Priority number, date | US19870012479 | 09.02.1987 Original published format: US 12479 | [1989/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8805838 | Date: | 11.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0334851 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334851 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/00, B29C67/00 | [1989/40] | CPC: |
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
B01D39/2006 (EP,US);
B29B11/16 (EP,US);
B29C70/443 (EP,US);
B29C70/48 (EP,US);
B29C70/502 (EP,US);
D04H1/4218 (EP,US);
D04H1/5418 (EP,US);
D04H1/55 (EP,US);
D04H1/64 (EP,US);
D04H1/732 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0464 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0636 (EP,US);
B01D2239/064 (EP,US);
B01D2239/086 (EP,US);
B01D2239/10 (EP,US);
B29B15/105 (EP,US);
B29C43/12 (EP,US);
B29K2101/10 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/09] |
Former [1989/40] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON FORMTEILEN | [1989/40] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MOLDED ARTICLES | [1989/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ARTICLES MOULES | [1989/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.1989 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/40] | 12.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2459804 [ ] (FRANCIS JR CARLETON S); | US2464301 [ ] (FRANCIS JR CARLETON S); | US4195112 [ ] (SHEARD DENNIS R [GB], et al); | GB2096195 [ ] (DRESSER CORP); | EP0093393 [ ] (JAMES RIVER CORP [US]); | EP0148760 [ ] (WIGGINS TEAPE GROUP LTD [GB]); | EP0148762 [ ] (WIGGINS TEAPE GROUP LTD [GB]) |