Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE72104T | 15.02.1992 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP8700679 | 05.11.1987 | EP87907322 | 05.11.1987 | DE3638091 | 07.11.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3776575D1 | 12.03.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP8700679 | 05.11.1987 | DE3776575 | 05.11.1987 | DE3638091 | 07.11.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8803399 | Global Dossier | 19.05.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3638091 | 07.11.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0324795 | Global Dossier | 29.01.1992 | B1 | EP0324795 | 26.07.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3638091 | 07.11.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3638091 | 19.05.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3638091 | 07.11.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0351422B | 06.08.1991 | B2 | JPH02500413 | 15.02.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3638091 | 07.11.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5028065 | 02.07.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3638091 | 07.11.1986 |