Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0289623
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
30.07.1994 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] |
05.01.1994 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] |
12.08.1993 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] |
27.03.1992 |
First examination report |
|
08.08.1990 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] |
24.09.1988 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] |
24.09.1988 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] |