EP0276656 - Fixing arrangement for a centrifugal pump impeller made of brittle material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.1988 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.02.1989 [1989/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | ||
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states Klein, Schanzlin & Becker Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heumann, Anton Salzburger Strasse 103 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1988/31] | Application number, filing date | 88100138.2 | 08.01.1988 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | DE19873702016 | 24.01.1987 Original published format: DE 3702016 | [1988/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276656 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276656 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/20, F04D29/22 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
F04D29/20 (EP,US);
F04D29/2227 (EP,US);
F05D2300/10 (EP,US);
F05D2300/20 (EP,US);
F05D2300/518 (EP,US);
Y10T403/217 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/31] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Befestigung eines Kreiselpumpenlaufrades aus einem spröden Werkstoff | [1988/31] | English: | Fixing arrangement for a centrifugal pump impeller made of brittle material | [1988/31] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'une roue à arbres de pompe centrifuge en matière fragile | [1988/31] | File destroyed: | 31.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2643851 (MCMAHAN KENTON D); | [X]FR1122205 (ONERA (OFF NAT AEROSPATIALE)); | [X]DE1059245 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | [A]DE2845199 (SAVONUZZI GIOVANNI F) |