EP0274401 - Hydrocyanation of butadiene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1992 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [1988/28] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY Barley Plaza, Building 17, P.O. Box 80017 Wilmington, DE 19880-0017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rapoport, Morris 16 Knotty Pine Orange Texas 77630 / US | [1988/28] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100175.4 | 08.01.1988 | [1988/28] | Priority number, date | US19870005431 | 09.01.1987 Original published format: US 5431 | [1988/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0274401 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274401 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C253/10, C07C255/07 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07C253/10 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/10, C07C255/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/28] | C07C121/30, C07C120/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1988/28] | Title | German: | Hydrocyanierung von Butadien | [1988/28] | English: | Hydrocyanation of butadiene | [1988/28] | French: | Hydrocyanisation du butadiène | [1988/28] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/05] | 09.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1593277 [ ] (DU PONT); | US3903120 [ ] (SHOOK JR HOWARD E, et al); | US4330483 [ ] (RAPOPORT MORRIS) |