EP0277488 - Discharge lamp, particularly a flash tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heimann GmbH Weher Köppel 6 Postfach 30 07 D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states Heimann GmbH Weher Köppel 6 Postfach 30 07 D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Achter, Eugen Im Hollerbusch 5 D-6097 Trebur 3 / DE | 02 /
Dünisch, Ingo, Dipl.-Phys. Wuenostrasse 26 D-6204 Taunusstein / DE | 03 /
Lausch, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. Im Obergrund 7 D-6204 Taunusstein / DE | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/32] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100260.4 | 11.01.1988 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | DE19870001119U | 23.01.1987 Original published format: DE 8701119 U | [1988/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277488 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277488 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J5/46, H01J9/28, H01J61/36 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
H01J5/46 (EP,US);
H01J61/36 (EP,US);
H01J9/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/32] | Title | German: | Entladungslampe, insbesondere Blitzröhre | [1988/32] | English: | Discharge lamp, particularly a flash tube | [1988/32] | French: | Lampe à décharge, particulièrement tube éclair | [1988/32] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 15.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.09.1990 | IT | 12.09.1990 | NL | 12.09.1990 | CH | 31.01.1991 | LI | 31.01.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 12.09.1990 | |
NL | 12.09.1990 | ||
CH | 31.01.1991 | ||
LI | 31.01.1991 | ||
FR | 01.02.1991 | ||
Former [1992/05] | NL | 12.09.1990 | |
CH | 31.01.1991 | ||
LI | 31.01.1991 | ||
FR | 01.02.1991 | ||
Former [1991/50] | NL | 12.09.1990 | |
FR | 01.02.1991 | ||
Former [1991/34] | NL | 12.09.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB435527 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD); | [A]DE3329270 (HEIMANN GMBH [DE]) |