EP0283639 - Door assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.1989 [1989/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Gerhard R. Schmidt Nierfeldstrasse 2 D-5804 Herdecke / DE | [1988/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Gerhard Christian, Dipl.-wirt (VWA) Fleyer Strasse 158 D-5800 Hagen 1 / DE | [1988/39] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Volkmar Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur. Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100322.2 | 12.01.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | DE19873705506 | 20.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3705506 | [1988/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0283639 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/72, E06B3/96 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
E06B3/984 (EP);
E06B3/74 (EP);
A47B2230/0037 (EP);
E06B2003/7055 (EP);
E06B2003/7096 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1988/39] | Title | German: | Bausatz für eine Tür | [1988/39] | English: | Door assembly | [1988/39] | French: | Ensemble constructif pour porte | [1988/39] | File destroyed: | 15.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 29.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/46] | 19.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL8101220 ; | [X]US2706543 ; | [Y]FR2491986 ; | [Y]US1635466 ; | [Y]FR2163343 ; | [Y]DE2442147 ; | [Y]DE2441323 ; | [Y]DE3441319 ; | [A]US1919702 ; | [A]DE1683661 ; | [A]NL8005886 ; | [A]US4001972 |