EP0280851 - Process for compressing pyrogenic silica [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klingel, Reinhard, Dr. Taunusstraat 6 D-8755 Wasserlos / DE | 02 /
Manner, Reinhard, Dr. Bonhoefferstrasse 17 D-6457 Dörnigheim / DE | [1988/36] | Application number, filing date | 88100580.5 | 16.01.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | DE19873706137 | 26.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3706137 | DE19873741846 | 10.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3741846 | [1988/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0280851 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0280851 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/30, C01B33/18, B30B5/04, B01J2/22 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
C09C1/3009 (EP,US);
B01J2/22 (EP,US);
B30B5/04 (EP,US);
C01P2006/11 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verdichten von pyrogen hergestellter Kieselsäure | [1988/36] | English: | Process for compressing pyrogenic silica | [1988/36] | French: | Procédé de compression de silice pyrogénique | [1988/36] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 18.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0010655 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]); | [YD]DD43981 ; | [YD]DE1129459 (DEGUSSA) |