EP0275962 - 3-Methylenespiro benzofuran-piperidines , intermediates and a process for the preparation thereof, and their use as medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/30] | 3-Methylenespiro [benzofuran-piperidines], intermediates and a process for the preparation thereof, and their use as medicaments | ||
[2007/46] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.1990 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Change - German title | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosley, Raymond Walter, Jr. 659 Cedarbrook Road Bridgewater, N.J. 08807 / US | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Becker, Heinrich Karl Engelbert, et al HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Gebäude F 821 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | Becker, Heinrich Karl Engelbert, Dr., et al HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100641.5 | 19.01.1988 | [1988/30] | Priority number, date | US19870006035 | 22.01.1987 Original published format: US 6035 | [1988/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0275962 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0275962 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/10, A61K31/435, C07D211/48, C07D405/06, // (C07D491/10, 307:00, 221:00) | [1988/30] | CPC: |
C07D405/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D491/107 (KR);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D211/48 (EP,KR,US);
C07D491/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/30] | Title | German: | 3-Methylenspiro benzofuranpiperidine , Zwischenprodukte und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Arzneimittel | [2007/46] | English: | 3-Methylenespiro benzofuran-piperidines , intermediates and a process for the preparation thereof, and their use as medicaments | [2007/46] | French: | 3-Méthylenspiro benzofuranpipéridines , intermédiaires et leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation comme médicaments | [2007/46] |
Former [1988/30] | 3-Methylenspiro[benzofuranpiperidine], Zwischenprodukte und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Arzneimittel | ||
Former [1988/30] | 3-Methylenespiro [benzofuran-piperidines], intermediates and a process for the preparation thereof, and their use as medicaments | ||
Former [1988/30] | 3-Méthylenspiro[benzofuranpipéridines], intermédiaires et leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation comme médicaments | File destroyed: | 28.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 16.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 09.05.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0104632 (HOECHST ROUSSEL PHARMA [US]); | [A]EP0139138 (HOECHST ROUSSEL PHARMA [US]) |