EP0277539 - Method for gas sealing of phosphoric acid-type fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsuda, Kenro c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Central Res. Lab. 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Shiota, Hisashi c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Central Res. Lab. 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Kenzo c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Materials Eng.Lab. 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Shimamoto, Kozo c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Materials Eng.Lab. 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | 05 /
Murahashi, Toshiaki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Materials Eng.Lab. 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | 06 /
Hirata, Ikuyuki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Materials Eng.Lab. 1-1, Tsukaguchi Honmachi8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100669.6 | 19.01.1988 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | JP19870012820 | 21.01.1987 Original published format: JP 1282087 | [1988/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277539 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277539 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M2/08 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
H01M8/0271 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y10T29/4911 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49115 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IT, NL [1988/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gasabdichtung einer Brennstoffzelle des Phosphorsäuretyps | [1988/32] | English: | Method for gas sealing of phosphoric acid-type fuel cell | [1988/32] | French: | Méthode pour rendre étanche au gaz une pile à combustible du type à acide phosphorique | [1988/32] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 27.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58108670 ; | [AD]JP61013572 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 214 (E-199)[1359], 21st September 1983; & JP-A-58 108 670 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 28-06-1983, & JP58108670 A 00000000 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 158 (E-409)[2214], 6th June 1986; & JP-A-61 013 572 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 21-01-1986, & JP61013572 A 00000000 |