EP0287752 - Electromagnetic switchgear with electromagnetic drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moeller GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states Klöckner-Moeller GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 D-53115 Bonn / DE | ||
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states Klöckner-Moeller Elektrizitäts GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 D-53115 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aulmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Kuckucksweg 15 D-5300 Bonn 1 / DE | 02 /
Brucksch, Norbert Eiserweg D-5309 Meckenheim / DE | 03 /
Buchbender, Guido Gregor-Mendel-Strasse 34 D-5300 Bonn 1 / DE | 04 /
Rossmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Bunte Strasse 15 D-7500 Karlsruhe / DE | 05 /
Vogelsang, Werner Karlstrasse 93 D-5340 Bad Honnef / DE | 06 /
Voiss, Gerd, Ing.-grad. Haupstrasse 302 D-5000 Köln 90 / DE | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Klaus-Jürgen Rondorfer Strasse 5A 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | Schwarz, Klaus-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Gluckstrasse 7 D-53115 Bonn / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100712.4 | 20.01.1988 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | DE19873713412 | 22.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3713412 | [1988/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287752 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287752 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287752 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/64, H01H71/00, H01H71/66 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
H01H89/08 (EP);
H01H71/2409 (EP);
H01H71/2463 (EP);
H01H71/46 (EP);
H01H71/7409 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/43] | H01H50/64, H01H71/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/43] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisches Schaltgerät mit elektromagnetischem Antrieb | [1988/43] | English: | Electromagnetic switchgear with electromagnetic drive | [1988/43] | French: | Interrupteur électromagnétique avec entraînement électromagnétique | [1988/43] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 27.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0179677 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]); | [Y]FR962941 ; | [A]FR546555 (KRUPP AG); | [A]FR2408209 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]) |