EP0307531 - Sealing fittings for fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastromatteo, Ciro Via Brigata Tridentina, 81 I-36043 Camisano Vicentino (VI) / IT | [1989/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [1989/12] | Bonini, Ercole c/o STUDIO ING. E. Bonini SRL Corso Fogazzaro, 8 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 88100726.4 | 20.01.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | IT19870085602 | 17.09.1987 Original published format: IT 8560287 | [1989/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0307531 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307531 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L19/06, F16L19/08, F16L47/00 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
F16L47/04 (EP,US);
F16L19/0653 (EP);
F16L19/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/12] | Title | German: | Dichtungseinrichtung für Flüssigkeiten | [1989/12] | English: | Sealing fittings for fluids | [1989/12] | French: | Raccord d'étanchéite pour fluides | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 27.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB454793 (GASKELL & CHAMBERS LTD, et al); | [X]US3219367 (FRANCK GEORGE E); | [A]FR2302476 (LOTIGIE ETS [FR]) |