EP0305631 - Arrangement for coupling a pressurized container to a gas-dispensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1993 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 06.10.1993 [1993/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company P.O.Drawer 1734 Atlanta, GA 30301 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 D-81669 München / DE | ||
For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY P.O.Drawer 1734 Atlanta, Georgia 30301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aschberger, Matthias, Dipl.-Ing. Am Läutenberg 9/1 D-7928 Giengen / DE | 02 /
Färber, Karlheinz, Dipl.-Ing. Giegerweg 1 D-7928 Giengen / DE | 03 /
Deininger, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Vogtstrasse 20 D-8887 Bachhagel / DE | [1989/10] | Representative(s) | Rode, Franz, et al BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GMBH Patent- und Vertragswesen Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | Rode, Franz, et al BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GMBH Patent- und Vertragswesen Hochstrasse 17 D-81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100752.0 | 09.07.1985 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | DE19843430926 | 22.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3430926 | DE19843430900 | 22.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3430900 | DE19843430928 | 22.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3430928 | [1989/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0305631 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0305631 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305631 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/00, B01F3/04, F17C13/00 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
F17C13/084 (EP,US);
B01F23/2361 (EP,US);
B01F33/5014 (EP,US);
B67D1/008 (EP,US);
F17C13/04 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0329 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0382 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/10] | F17C13/00, B01F3/04, B67D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/10] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum steckbaren Anflanschen eines Druckbehälters an eine Gasentnahme-Einrichtung | [1989/10] | English: | Arrangement for coupling a pressurized container to a gas-dispensing device | [1989/10] | French: | Agencement pour raccorder par enfichage un réservoir sous pression à un dispositif de prélèvement de gaz | [1989/10] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP85108486.3 / EP0173822 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [1993/40] |
Former [1993/28] | DE | 23.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE267326 ; | [Y]DE166922 ; | [A]US4103712 (FLETCHER JAMES C ADMINISTRATOR, et al); | [X]WO8201542 (CADBURY SCHWEPPES USA INC [US]) |