EP0280864 - Needle print head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Herbert Gehrdener-Weg 11 D-4790 Paderborn / DE | 02 /
Anton, Karl-Heinz Rummelsberg 1 D-4790 Paderborn / DE | 03 /
Homner, Harald Am Krebsbach 10a D-4790 Paderborn / DE | [1988/36] | Representative(s) | Thoenes, Dieter Patentanwälte Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | Thoenes, Dieter, Dr. Patentanwälte Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Postfach 86 07 48 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/36] | Thoenes, Dieter, Dr. Patentanwälte Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Postfach 86 07 48 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100870.0 | 21.01.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | DE19873706730 | 02.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3706730 | [1988/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0280864 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0280864 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0280864 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/28, H01F7/14 | [1991/33] | CPC: |
B41J2/275 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/49] | B41J3/12, H01F7/14 | ||
Former IPC [1988/36] | B41J3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/36] | Title | German: | Nadeldruckkopf | [1988/36] | English: | Needle print head | [1988/36] | French: | Tête d'impression à aiquilles | [1988/36] | Examination procedure | 01.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 20.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.08.1991 | GR | 14.08.1991 | DE | 02.12.1991 | AT | 21.01.1992 | CH | 31.01.1992 | LI | 31.01.1992 | LU | 31.01.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 14.08.1991 | |
DE | 02.12.1991 | ||
AT | 21.01.1992 | ||
CH | 31.01.1992 | ||
LI | 31.01.1992 | ||
LU | 31.01.1992 | ||
Former [1997/17] | BE | 14.08.1991 | |
DE | 02.12.1991 | ||
AT | 21.01.1992 | ||
CH | 31.01.1992 | ||
LI | 31.01.1992 | ||
Former [1994/18] | BE | 14.08.1991 | |
DE | 02.12.1991 | ||
AT | 21.01.1992 | ||
CH | 31.01.1992 | ||
LI | 31.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/49] | BE | 14.08.1991 | |
DE | 02.12.1991 | ||
CH | 31.01.1992 | ||
LI | 31.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | BE | 14.08.1991 | |
DE | 02.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/16] | DE | 02.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2026401 (ROOTES MOTORS LTD); | [A]DE2256813 (RICOH KK); | [A]US4242004 (ADLER ROBERT [US]); | [Y]US4382701 (DAVENPORT KEITH B [GB]) |