EP0276844 - Connecting element for the manufacture of a detachable connection between a pallet and a foldable container of corrugated board or cardboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/31] | Connecting element for the manufacture of a soluble connection between a pallet and a foldable container of corrugated board or cardboard | ||
[1992/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Europa Carton Aktiengesellschaft Spitaler Strasse 11 D-20095 Hamburg / DE | [1988/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wittmann, Fritz W. Am Hasenspiel 23 D-6729 Bellheim / DE | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Stasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1988/31] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Postfach 73 04 66, Grubesallee 26 D-22124 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101208.2 | 28.01.1988 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | DE19873702848 | 29.01.1987 Original published format: DE 3702848 | [1988/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276844 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276844 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0276844 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/06 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
B65D19/20 (EP);
B65D2519/00019 (EP);
B65D2519/00029 (EP);
B65D2519/00034 (EP);
B65D2519/00044 (EP);
B65D2519/00054 (EP);
B65D2519/00064 (EP);
B65D2519/00069 (EP);
B65D2519/00099 (EP);
B65D2519/00159 (EP);
B65D2519/00194 (EP);
B65D2519/00268 (EP);
B65D2519/00273 (EP);
B65D2519/00318 (EP);
B65D2519/00323 (EP);
B65D2519/00333 (EP);
B65D2519/00497 (EP);
B65D2519/00597 (EP);
B65D2519/00641 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1988/42] |
Former [1988/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL | Title | German: | Verbindungselement zur Herstellung einer lösbaren Verbindung zwischen einer Palette und einem faltbaren Behälter aus Wellpappe, Pappe oder ähnlichem Material | [1988/31] | English: | Connecting element for the manufacture of a detachable connection between a pallet and a foldable container of corrugated board or cardboard | [1992/16] | French: | Elément de connexion pour la fabrication d'une connexion amovible entre une palette et un récipient pliable de carton ondulé ou de carton | [1992/16] |
Former [1988/31] | Connecting element for the manufacture of a soluble connection between a pallet and a foldable container of corrugated board or cardboard | ||
Former [1988/31] | Elément de connexion pour la fabrication d'une connexion soluble entre une palette et un récipient pliable de carton ondulé ou de carton | Examination procedure | 25.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, IT, LU | 25.07.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 02.08.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 24.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Request for further processing for: | 21.12.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.02.1988 | ES   M02   Not yet paid | 29.02.1988 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 29.02.1988 | LU   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.04.1992 | GB | 15.04.1992 | NL | 15.04.1992 | [1993/14] |
Former [1993/01] | BE | 15.04.1992 | |
NL | 15.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | NL | 15.04.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2083444 (MAC MILLAN BLOEDEL CONTAINERS); | [A]AU3165684 (VISY BOARD CO PTY); | [X]GB2150533 (REED INT PLC); | [A]FR2575727 (GHEYSENS FRANCIS [FR]) |