EP0278342 - Use of a material as a hard magnetic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/33] | Iron-containing magnetic material | ||
[1993/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Alfred, Dr. Fichtestrasse 25 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1988/33] | Application number, filing date | 88101333.8 | 29.01.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | DE19873704238 | 11.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3704238 | [1988/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278342 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278342 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278342 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/04 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
C22C38/12 (EP);
H01F1/055 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/33] | Title | German: | Verwendung eines Materials als hartmagnetisches Werkstoff | [1993/03] | English: | Use of a material as a hard magnetic material | [1993/03] | French: | Utilisation d'un matériel comme matériel magnétique dur | [1993/03] |
Former [1988/33] | Eisenhaltiges, magnetisches Material | ||
Former [1988/33] | Iron-containing magnetic material | ||
Former [1988/33] | Matériau magnétique contenant du fer | Examination procedure | 28.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 26.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.01.1993 | GB | 20.01.1993 | NL | 20.01.1993 | AT | 29.01.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1994/32] | GB | 20.01.1993 | |
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
AT | 29.01.1993 | ||
FR | 11.06.1993 | ||
Former [1993/49] | GB | 20.01.1993 | |
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
FR | 11.06.1993 | ||
Former [1993/48] | GB | 20.01.1993 | |
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | NL | 20.01.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61010209 | [A] - FIZIKO MATEMATICESKIE I TECHNICESKIE NAUKI/DOKLADY AKADEMII NAUK UKRAINSKOJ SSR, Nr. 5, 1985, Seiten 83-84, US; O.I. BODAK et al.: "CICTEMA Ce-Fe-Mo" | [A] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, Band 52, Nr. 3, März 1981, Seiten 2064-2066, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; Z.-B. LIU et al.: "A study of the rhombohedral distortion of the magnetostrictive samarium-iron compounds with addition of molybdenum or vanadium" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 150 (E-408)[2207], 31. Mai 1986; & JP-A-61 010 209 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 17-01-1986, & JP61010209 A 00000000 | [XP] - JOURNAL OF LESS-COMMON METALS, Band 136, Januar 1988, Seiten 207-215, Elsevier Sequoia, NL; D.B. DE MOOIJ et al.: "Some novel ternary ThMn12-type compounds" | Examination | EP0235428 |