Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] |
26.06.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.08.1992 [1992/33] |
10.12.1991 | First examination report | |
25.10.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.12.1989 [1989/50] |
26.04.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 14.06.1989 [1989/24] |
07.04.1989 | Change - classification | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] |
24.09.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] |