EP0289701 - Multicylinder turbo-compressed engine with external ignition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gietzen, Staas, Dipl.-Ing. Rosenstrasse 1 D-7107 Obereisesheim / DE | 02 /
Beer, Michael Uhlandstrasse 32 D-7251 Wimsheim / DE | 03 /
Hain, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Obere Torstrasse 10 D-7250 Leonberg / DE | [1988/45] | Application number, filing date | 88101458.3 | 02.02.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | DE19873715062 | 06.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3715062 | [1988/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0289701 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0289701 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289701 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F02P7/02, F02P7/04, H01T13/16 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
F02P7/04 (EP,US);
F02P7/021 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/45] | F02P7/02, F02P7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/45] | Title | German: | Fremdgezündete Mehrzylinder-Brennkraftmaschine mit Turbolader | [1988/45] | English: | Multicylinder turbo-compressed engine with external ignition | [1988/45] | French: | Moteur à combustion turbocompressé multicylindre à allumage externe | [1988/45] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2195825 (PRICE NATHAN C); | [A]US2207368 (ARTHUR JAMES L); | [A]US2257781 (JAKOB BOHLI); | [A]US2310575 (CATTANEO ALFRED G); | [A]US2323792 (CATTANEO ALFRED G); | [A]FR2464379 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |