EP0282718 - Interlocking roofing tile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1990 [1990/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pehl, Martin Ernst-Mezger-Strasse 17 86316 Friedberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states Pehl, Martin Ernst-Mezger-Strasse 17 D-86316 Friedberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101543.2 | 03.02.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | DE19873708274 | 13.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3708274 | [1988/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282718 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282718 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04D1/04 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
E04D1/2949 (EP,US);
E04D1/2916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1988/38] | Title | German: | Dachfalzziegel | [1988/38] | English: | Interlocking roofing tile | [1988/38] | French: | Tuile à emboîtement | [1988/38] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 30.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR408706 ; | [A]FR321794 (BEYELER GOTTLIEB [FR]); | [A]GB447937 (ALWYN HOWARTH THWAITE); | [A]FR895896 (CARL LUDOWICI K A A); | [A]FR1085102 (TUILERIES DE LA COTE BASQUE); | [A]CH603965 (BETHKE RUEDIGER); | [A]DE3334926 (CPM CERAMIC PATENT MANAGEMENT [US]); | [A]FR2567178 (DUCROT JEAN PIERRE [FR]) |