EP0280091 - Incinerator and method for incineration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. 1-go, 2-ban, 2-chome, Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. 1-go, 2-ban, 2-chome, Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Motomura, Takehiko 52-9, Maruyama-cho 3-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba / JP | [1988/35] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/35] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101649.7 | 04.02.1988 | [1988/35] | Priority number, date | JP19870022295 | 04.02.1987 Original published format: JP 2229587 | [1988/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0280091 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/16, F23G5/20, F23G5/30 | [1988/35] | CPC: |
F23G5/20 (EP);
F23G5/16 (EP);
F23G5/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/43] |
Former [1988/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Abfallverbrennungsanlage und Verfahren zur Abfallverbrennung | [1988/35] | English: | Incinerator and method for incineration | [1988/35] | French: | Incinérateur et procédé d'incinération | [1988/35] | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 05.03.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, GR, LU, NL, SE | 01.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/39] | 02.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/02] | 27.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.03.1988 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 04.03.1988 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 04.03.1988 | GR   M02   Not yet paid | 04.03.1988 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 04.03.1988 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 04.03.1988 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP54141068 [ ]; | JP58219316 [ ]; | JP57065514 [ ]; | [Y]US4060042 ; | [A]US3822651 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 6 (M-88), 18th January 1980, page 2 M 88; & JP-A-54 141 068 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) 01-11-1979, & JP54141068 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 73 (M-287)[1510], 5th pril 1984; & JP-A-58 219 316 (EBARA SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 20-12-1983, & JP58219316 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 146 (M-147)[1024], 5th August 1982; & JP-A-57 065 514 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA JUKOGYO K.K.) 21-04-1982, & JP57065514 A 00000000 |