EP0278425 - Data processing system and method with management of a mass storage buffer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barrett, Gerald George 14911 Alpha Collier Drive Austin Texas 78728 / US | 02 /
Pasha, Syed Zahid 12700 Timberside Drive Austin Texas 78727 / US | 03 /
Shaheen-Gouda, Amal Ahmed 11502 Sweetshade Lane Austin Texas 78759 / US | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Bailey, Geoffrey Alan IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | Bailey, Geoffrey Alan IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1988/33] | Hawkins, Anthony George Frederick IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88101695.0 | 05.02.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | US19870014901 | 13.02.1987 Original published format: US 14901 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278425 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278425 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278425 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
G06F12/0866 (EP);
G06F12/0862 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/33] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungsanordnung und Verfahren mit Massenspeicherpufferverwaltung | [1988/33] | English: | Data processing system and method with management of a mass storage buffer | [1988/33] | French: | Système et procédé de traitement de données avec gestion d'un tampon de mémoire de masse | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 04.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4437155 (SAWYER DANIEL D [US], et al); | [Y]US4530055 (HAMSTRA JAMES R [US], et al); | [A]EP0109309 (STORAGE TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 3, August 1981, pages 1559-1562, New York, US; B.T. BENNETT et al.: "Improving performance of buffered DASD to which some references are sequential" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 26, no. 3B, August 1983, pages 1746-1747, New York, US; H.E. KAMIONKA et al.: "Limited replacement and migration controls" |