EP0278434 - A blade, especially a rotor blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weinhold, Wolfgang P. Wiener Ring 17 D-97084 Würzburg / DE | [1988/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Petra, Elke, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Am Rurufer 2 52349 Düren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Petra, Elke, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Gutenbergstrasse 12 52349 Düren / DE | ||
Former [1994/48] | Petra, Elke, Dipl.-Ing., et al Will & Petra Rechts- und Patentanwälte Neue Poststrasse 21 D-85598 Baldham / DE | ||
Former [1994/46] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1988/33] | Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Czybulka Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38 D-81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101712.3 | 05.02.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | US19870011788 | 06.02.1987 Original published format: US 11788 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278434 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278434 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278434 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/20, F01D5/18, F01D11/10, F01D5/14 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
F01D11/10 (EP);
F01D5/145 (EP);
F01D5/18 (EP);
F01D5/20 (EP);
F04D29/684 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | Rotorblatt | [1988/33] | English: | A blade, especially a rotor blade | [1988/33] | French: | Aube de rotor | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 29.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 29.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 20.07.1994 | LI | 20.07.1994 | [1995/03] | Documents cited: | Search | GB2077363 [ ] (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP); | US4020538 [ ] (DENNIS RONALD E, et al); | GB2075129 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC); | DE1024754 [ ] (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | GB2010981 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC) |