EP0278440 - Use of sulphurous acid cyclic esters in dyeing polyamide textile materials, and dyeing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 22.05.1991 [1991/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heimann, Sigismund, Dr. Am Weidenschlag 46 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Vescia, Michele, Dr. Carl-Bosch-Strasse 62 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 03 /
Bereck, Attila, Dr. Maxburgstrasse 10 D-6701 Maxdorf / DE | 04 /
Sulz, Hermann Virchowstrasse 6 D-6712 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | 05 /
Steenken, Ingrid, Dr. Schenkenboehler Strasse 6 D-6702 Bad Duerkheim / DE | [1988/33] | Application number, filing date | 88101754.5 | 06.02.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | DE19873704125 | 11.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3704125 | [1988/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278440 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/33] | Classification | IPC: | D06P1/651, D06P3/04 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
D06P1/65168 (EP,US);
Y10S526/917 (EP,US);
Y10S8/917 (US);
Y10S8/924 (US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/33] | Title | German: | Verwendung von cyclischen Estern der schwefeligen Säure beim Färben von Textilmaterialien aus Polyamid und Verfahren zum Färben | [1988/33] | English: | Use of sulphurous acid cyclic esters in dyeing polyamide textile materials, and dyeing process | [1988/33] | French: | Utilisation d'esters cycliques d'acide sulfureux dans la teinture de matières textiles en polyamide et procédé de teinture | [1988/33] | File destroyed: | 16.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 14.03.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |