EP0291633 - Use of 3'-azido-3'-deoxythymidine in the treatment or prophylaxis of human retroviral infections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.1993 [1993/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road P.O. Box 129 London NW1 2BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road London NW1 2BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rideout, Janes Litster 3101 Morningside Drive Raleigh, NC / US | 02 /
Barry, David Walter 1810S Lakeshore Drive Chapel Hill, NC / US | 03 /
Lehrman, Sandra Nusinoff 2720 Old Sugar Road Durham, NC / US | 04 /
St Clair, Martha Heider 312 Seven Oaks Road Durham, NC / US | 05 /
Furman, Phillip Allen 901 Bluestone Road Durham, NC / US | [1992/45] |
Former [1988/47] | 01 /
Rideout, Janes Litster 3101 Morningside Drive Raleigh North Carolina / US | ||
02 /
Barry, David Walter 1810S Lakeshore Drive Chapel Hill North Carolina / US | |||
03 /
Lehrman, Sandra Nusinoff 2720 Old Sugar Road Durham North Carolina / US | |||
04 /
St Clair, Martha Heider 312 Seven Oaks Road Durham North Carolina / US | |||
05 /
Furman, Phillip Allen 901 Bluestone Road Durham North Carolina / US | Representative(s) | Garrett, Michael, et al Glaxo Wellcome plc, Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | Garrett, Michael, et al The Wellcome Research Laboratories Group Patents and Agreements Langley Court Beckenham Kent BR3 3BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88101790.9 | 14.03.1986 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | GB19850006869 | 16.03.1985 Original published format: GB 8506869 | GB19850011774 | 09.05.1985 Original published format: GB 8511774 | GB19850023881 | 27.09.1985 Original published format: GB 8523881 | GB19860003450 | 12.02.1986 Original published format: GB 8603450 | US19850776899 | 17.09.1985 Original published format: US 776899 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0291633 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0291633 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, C07H19/073 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K31/7072 (EP);
A61K38/212 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07H19/06 (EP);
C07H19/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/212, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/47] | Title | German: | Verwendung von 3'-Azido-3'-deoxythymidin zur Behandlung oder Vorbeugung von menschlichen Retrovirus-Infektionen | [1988/47] | English: | Use of 3'-azido-3'-deoxythymidine in the treatment or prophylaxis of human retroviral infections | [1988/47] | French: | Utilisation de la 3'azido-3'-déoxythymidine pour le traitement ou la prophylaxie des infections humaines à rétrovirus | [1988/47] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 18.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86301897.4 / EP0196185 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, vol. 116, no. 1, 1978, pages 31-37, Academic Press Inc., SE; W. OSTERTAG et al.: "Induction of intracisternal A-type particles during friend cell differentiation" | [XD] - EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, vol. 116, no. 1, 1978, pages 21-29, Academic Press Inc., SE; C.J. KRIEG et al.: "Increase in intracisternal A-type particles in friend cells during inhibition of friend virus (SFFV) release by interferon or azidothymidine" | [XD] - PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 71, no. 12, December 1974, pages 4980-4985, US; W. OSTERTAG et al.: "Induction of endogenous virus and of thymidine kinase by bromodeoxyuridine in cell cultures transformed by friend virus" | [XP] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 82, October 1985, pages 7096-7100, US; H. MITSUYA et al.: "3'-azido-3'-deoxythymidine (BW A509U): an antiviral agent that inhibits the infectivity and cytopathic effect of human T-lymphotropic virus type III/lymphadenopathy-associated virus in vitro" | [XP] - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICES, file 267; DeHaen Drug Data, 1980-1987; & 25TH INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS CHEMOTHERAPY, Minneapolis, US, September 29 - October 2, 1985; Abstracts no. 437-440. Réf. no. 0180178: M.H. St CLAIR et al.: "Characterization of HTLV-3 reverse transciotase and inhibition by the triphosphate of BW A509U." & Abstract 439 | [XP] - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICES, file 267; DeHaen Drug Data, 1980-1987; & 25TH INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS CHEMOTHERAPY, Minneapolis, US, September 29 - October 2, 1985; Abstracts no. 437-440. Réf. no. 0180181: W.D. HARDY Jr. et al.: "Anti-viral effects of BW A509U against a naturally occuring feline acquired immune deficiency syndrome (FAIDS)-inducing retrovirus" & Abstract 438 | [XP] - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICES, file 267; DeHaen Drug Data, 1980-1987; & 25TH INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS CHEMOTHERAPY, Minneapolis, US, September 29 - October 2, 1985; Abstracts no. 440. Réf. no. 0180180: H. MITSUYA et al.: "BW A509U blocks HTLV-3 infection of T lymphocytes in culture" & Abstract 437 | [XP] - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICES, file 267; DeHaen Drug Data, 1980-1987; & 25TH INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS CHEMOTHERAPY, Minneapolis, US, September 29 - October 2, 1985; Abstracts no. 440. Réf. no. 0180179: P.A. FURMAN et al.: "Selective inhibition of HTLV-3 by BW A509U." & Abstract 440 | [XP] - JOURNAL OF THE AM. MED. ASSOC., vol. 254, no. 18, 8 November 1985, pages 2521,2527,2529: D.E. RIESENBERG: "Anti-AIDS agents show varying early results in vitro and in vivo" | [XP] - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICES, file 5; Biosis Previews 69-87; June, Réf. no. 0016194545: W.D. HARDY Jr. et al.: "Azidothymidine inhibits the replication of the feline leukemia virus." & J. CELL BIOCHEM. suppl. 0 (10 part A9, 1986, 207 | [XP] - CHEM. & ENG. NEWS, vol. 64, no. 4, 27th january 1986, pages 28-40; R.K. ROBINS: "Synthetic antiviral agents" | [XP] - FDA DRUG BULLETIN, vol. 15, no. 3, October 1985, pages 27-32, NN: "Progress on AIDS" | [XP] - PROCEEDINGS OF AM. ASSOC. CANCER RES., vol. 27, 77th Meeting, March 1986, page 422, ref. no. 1675; R.M. RUPRECHT et al.: "3'-Azido-3'-deoxythymidine (AZT) as antiretroviral agent in murine systems in vitro and in vivo" | [XP] - PROCEEDINGS OF AM. SOC. CLIN. ONCOL., vol. 5, 22nd Meeting, March 1986, page 1, ref. no. 4; R.W. KLECKER et al.: "Clinical pharmacology of 3'-azido-3'-deoxythymidine (N3TdR), a novel pyrimidine analog with potential application for the treatment of patients with AIDS and related diseases" | [A] - CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 32, no. 7, July 1972, pages 1547-1553; A.W. SCHRECKER et al.: "Inhibition of RNA-dependent DNA polymerase by thymidylate derivatives" | [T] - NATURE, vol. 323, 2nd October 1986, pages 467-469; R.M. RUPRECHT et al.: "Suppression of mouse viraemia and retroviral disease by 3'-azido-3'-deoxythymidine" | [T] - THE LANCET, vol. 1, no 8539, 25th April 1987, pages 957-958; NN: "Zidovudine (AZT)" | Examination | - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATL. ACADEMY OF SCIENCE USA, vol. 71, no. 12, December 1974; W.OSTERTAG et al., pp. 4980-4985* | - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATL. ACADEMY OF SCIENCE USA, vol. 82, October 1985; H.MITSUYA et al., pp. 7096-7100* | - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICES, file 267; DeHaen Drug Data, 1980-1987, & 25TH INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS CHEMOTHERAPY, Minneapolis, MN, (US); 29 September-02 October 1985; @M.H.St CLAIR et al., nos. 437-440, ref.0180178* @W.D.HARDY Jr. et al., nos. 437-440, ref. 0180181* @H.MITSUYA et al., no. 440, ref. 0180180* @P.A.FURMAN et al., no. 440, ref. 0180179* | - JOURNAL OF THE AM. MED. ASSOC., vol. 254, no. 18, 08 November 1985; D.E.RIESENBERG, pp. 2521, 2527, 2529* | - NATURE, vol. 323, 02 October 1986; R.M.RUPRECHT et al., pp. 467-469* | - THE LANCET, 26 August 1989; pp. 483-484* | - THE LANCET, 20 February 1988; pp. 373-376* | - THE LANCET, 07 April 1990; pp. 821-822* | - AM. J. MED., vol. 85, 1988; pp. 176-181* |