EP0278465 - Antineoplastic agent-entrapping liposomes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA VITAMIN KENKYUSHO 2134-1 Mitake Aza-Hirashiba Mitake-cho Kani-gun Gifu-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA VITAMIN KENKYUSHO 2134-1 Mitake Aza-Hirashiba Mitake-cho Kani-gun Gifu-ken / JP | ||
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA VITAMIN KENKYUSYO 2134-1, Mitake Aza-Hirashiba Mitake-cho Kani-gun Gigu-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurono, Masayasu K.K. Vitamin Kenkyusho 2134-1, Mitake Asa-Hirashiba Mitake-cho Kani-gun Gifu-ken / JP | 02 /
Noda, Hitoshi K.K. Vitamin Kenkyusho 2134-1, Mitake Asa-Hirashiba Mitake-cho Kani-gun Gifu-ken / JP | 03 /
Ogasawara, Tomio K.K. Vitamin Kenkyusho 2134-1, Mitake Asa-Hirashiba Mitake-cho Kani-gun Gifu-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamakawa, Hidefumi K.K. Vitamin Kenkyusho 2134-1, Mitake Asa-Hirashiba Mitake-cho Kani-gun Gifu-ken / JP | 05 /
Iida, Takafumi Kabushiki Kaisha Vitamin Kenkyusyo 2134-1, Mitake Asa-Hirashiba Mitake-cho Kani-gun Gifu-ken / JP | 06 /
Yagi, Kunio Kabushiki Kaisha Vitamin Kenkyusyo 2134-1, Mitake Asa-Hirashiba Mitake-cho Kani-gun Gifu-ken / JP | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101821.2 | 08.02.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | JP19870026321 | 09.02.1987 Original published format: JP 2632187 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0278465 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278465 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50, A61K31/71 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
Y10T428/2984 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/33] | Title | German: | Antineoplastika verkapselnde Liposomen | [1988/33] | English: | Antineoplastic agent-entrapping liposomes | [1988/33] | French: | Liposomes encapsulant d'agents antinéoplastiques | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 17.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8500664 (COOPER LIPOTECH INC [US]); | [AP]WO8706499 (OREAL [FR]); | [A]WO8203769 (UNIV GEORGETOWN [US]) | [YD] - BIOTECHNOLOGY AND APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 8, 1986, pages 471-478, Academic Press, Inc., Duluth, US; New York; N. KOJIMA et al.: "Effect of adriamycin entrapped by sulfatide-containing liposomes on ovarian tumor-bearing nude mice" | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, no. 23, 6th December 1982, page 254, abstract no. 194851z, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. BROCKERHOFF et al.: "Preparation and structural studies of cholesterol bilayers", & BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA 1982, 691(2), 227-32 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 9, 27th August 1984, page 263, abstract no. 68138k, Columbus, Ohio, US; C. LE GRIMELLEC et al.: "Cholesteryl sulfate-phosphatidylcholine interactions", & LIPIDS 1984, 19(6), 474-7 |