EP0284739 - Flavouring composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1992 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kratky, Zdenek 36, Candlewood Springs New Milford Conn. 06776 / US | 02 /
Vadehra, Dharam Vir 72, Old Farms Lane New Milford Conn. 06776 / US | [1988/40] | Application number, filing date | 88101826.1 | 09.02.1988 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | US19870025224 | 12.03.1987 Original published format: US 25224 | [1988/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0284739 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0284739 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0284739 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/221, A23L1/23 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
C12Y301/01003 (EP,US);
A23C19/063 (EP,US);
A23L27/25 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/40] | A23L1/221 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/40] | Title | German: | Duftzusammensetzung | [1988/40] | English: | Flavouring composition | [1988/40] | French: | Composition aromatisante | [1988/40] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/40] | 09.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3765905 (KASIK R, et al); | [A]GB1361817 (BRITISH FOOD MFG IND RES); | [A]EP0184105 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]US4595594 (LEE CHANG R [US], et al) |