EP0278502 - Inorganic metal salt as adjuvant for negative liquid electrostatic developers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
El-Sayed, Lyla Mostafa 1143 Pynchon Hall Road West Chester Pennsylvania 19382 / US | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1988/33] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101984.8 | 11.02.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | US19870014710 | 13.02.1987 Original published format: US 14710 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278502 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278502 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/12 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
G03G9/1355 (EP,US);
G03G9/135 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/33] | Title | German: | Anorganisches Metallsalz als Hilfsmittel für negative flüssige elektrostatische Entwickler | [1988/33] | English: | Inorganic metal salt as adjuvant for negative liquid electrostatic developers | [1988/33] | French: | Sel métallique inorganique comme adjuvant de développateurs électrostatiques liquides, négatifs | [1988/33] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 12.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 10.10.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2026390 ; | [A]DE2107596 (RANK XEROX LTD); | [A]EP0176630 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) | [A] - PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING vol. 28, no. 3, May 1984, LONDON GB pages 119 - 12; M.CROUCHER ET AL.: "COLLOIDAL AND TRANSPORT PROPERTIES OF ELECTROSTATICALLY BASED LIQUID DEVELOPERS" |