Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4780389 | 25.10.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US15928788 | 23.02.1988 | US1471087 | 13.02.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU591378B | Global Dossier | 30.11.1989 | B2 | AU1170388 | 08.09.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US1471087 | 13.02.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0278502 | Global Dossier | 18.04.1990 | A3 | EP0278502 | 17.08.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US1471087 | 13.02.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS63201669 | 19.08.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US1471087 | 13.02.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4758494 | 19.07.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US1471087 | 13.02.1987 |