EP0280117 - Lamellar shutter or lamellar gate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOSCH GMBH CO. Haldenstrasse 9 D-7024 Filderstadt 1 / DE | [1988/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Losch, Max H., Dr.-Ing. Haldenstrasse 9 D-7024 Filderstadt 1 / DE | [1988/35] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101986.3 | 11.02.1988 | [1988/35] | Priority number, date | DE19873706054 | 25.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3706054 | [1988/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0280117 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0280117 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/02 | [1988/35] | CPC: |
E06B9/0638 (EP,US);
E06B9/0676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/35] | Title | German: | Lamellen-Laden oder -Tor | [1988/35] | English: | Lamellar shutter or lamellar gate | [1988/35] | French: | Volet à lamelles ou porte à lamelles | [1988/35] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 06.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 18.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1992/09] | 07.10.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2703512 (BUTZBACH ARNOLD); | [A]CH610054 (BIRRER WILLY [CH]); | [X]EP0142564 (BUNKA SHUTTER [JP], et al); | [E]EP0263674 (BUNKA SHUTTER [JP], et al) |