EP0282734 - Integrated controlled power MOSFET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takagi, Yosuke c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Ohata, Yu c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Kitahara, Koichi c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 04 /
Kuramoto, Tsuyoshi c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101996.2 | 11.02.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | JP19870029553 | 13.02.1987 Original published format: JP 2955387 | [1988/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282734 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282734 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/06 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
H01L21/8249 (EP,US);
H01L27/0623 (EP,US);
H01L27/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/38] | Title | German: | Integrierter und kontrollierter Leistungs-MOSFET | [1988/38] | English: | Integrated controlled power MOSFET | [1988/38] | French: | MOSFET de puissance contrôlé intégré | [1994/17] |
Former [1988/38] | MOSFET de puissance contrôlé integré | Examination procedure | 11.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 24.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58206153 | [A] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, no. 4, 21st February 1985, pages 191-196, Hasbruck Heights, New Jersey, US; W. SCHULTZ et al.: "Mixed MOS devices unite in a switch chip that links power with smarts" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 53 (E-231)[1490], 9th March 1984; & JP-A-58 206 153 (DAINI SEIKOSHA K.K.) 01-12-1983, & JP58206153 A 00000000 | [A] - IEEE SPECTRUM, no. 1, January 1985, pages 60-64, New York, US, "In smarter design and fabrication of IC s, power and logic are mixed on the same chip and circuits are integrated over an entire wafer" |