EP0279356 - Hydraulic system for a construction machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Steven Harold 4880 Asbury Ct. Place Dubuque Iowa 52001 / US | 02 /
Williams, Lary Lynn 3866 Oneida Dubuque Iowa 52001 / US | [1988/34] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | [1990/49] |
Former [1988/34] | Collins, Geoffrey Stainton c/o Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 88102009.3 | 11.02.1988 | [1988/34] | Priority number, date | US19870016319 | 19.02.1987 Original published format: US 16319 | [1988/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0279356 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0279356 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/32, E02F3/22, F15B11/16, F15B13/09 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
E02F9/2232 (EP);
E02F9/2239 (EP);
E02F9/2292 (EP);
E02F9/2296 (EP);
F15B11/17 (EP);
F15B2211/20553 (EP);
F15B2211/20576 (EP);
F15B2211/30505 (EP);
F15B2211/3111 (EP);
F15B2211/351 (EP);
F15B2211/353 (EP);
F15B2211/6313 (EP);
F15B2211/65 (EP);
F15B2211/6651 (EP);
F15B2211/7142 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1988/34] | Title | German: | Hydraulisches System für eine Erdbewegungsmaschine | [1988/34] | English: | Hydraulic system for a construction machine | [1988/34] | French: | Système hydraulique pour un engin de terrassement | [1988/34] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 16.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4017215 ; | [X]FR2103965 ; | [XP]EP0235545 ; | [X]EP0071228 ; | [A]FR1555395 ; | [A]FR2111406 ; | [A]FR2383816 ; | [AP]EP0232683 |