EP0288673 - Profile to join a coat of plaster to a door frame, a window frame or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Protektorwerk Florenz Maisch GmbH & Co. KG Viktoriastrasse 58 76571 Gaggenau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states PROTEKTORWERK FLORENZ MAISCH GmbH & Co. KG Viktoriastrasse 58 D-76571 Gaggenau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dresel, Klaus Rotenfelser Strasse 19 D-7554 Kuppenheim 2 / DE | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | Geitz, Heinrich Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Patentanwälte, Kriegsstrasse 234 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | Geitz, Heinrich, Dr.-Ing. Kaiserstrasse 156 D-76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 88102132.3 | 13.02.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | DE19873714191 | 29.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3714191 | [1988/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0288673 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0288673 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0288673 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E04F19/02 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
E06B1/62 (EP);
E04F13/06 (EP);
E04F2013/063 (EP);
E04F2013/066 (EP);
E06B2001/624 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/44] | Title | German: | Profilleiste für den Anschluss einer Putzschicht an Türzargen, Fensterzargen oder dergleichen | [1988/44] | English: | Profile to join a coat of plaster to a door frame, a window frame or the like | [1988/44] | French: | Profilé pour joindre une couche d'enduit à un châssis de porte, un châssis de fenêtre ou similaires | [1988/44] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/52] | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.10.1991 | IT | 16.10.1991 | NL | 16.10.1991 | SE | 16.10.1991 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 16.10.1991 | |
IT | 16.10.1991 | ||
NL | 16.10.1991 | ||
SE | 16.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/37] | BE | 16.10.1991 | |
NL | 16.10.1991 | ||
SE | 16.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/26] | NL | 16.10.1991 | |
SE | 16.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/21] | SE | 16.10.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2369446 (GILLOT MARCEL [FR]); | [A]GB2096060 (ROBERTS TERENCE JOHN); | [A]DE3420897 (MAISCH F PROTEKTORWERK [DE]); | [A]DE8600241U |