EP0280156 - Process for the preparation of acetoacetylarylamides-heteroarylamides respectively of deactived aromatic compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Papenfuhs, Theodor, Dr. Heinrich-Bleicher-Strasse 40 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 50 / DE | 02 /
Daub, Wolfgang, Dr. Münsterer Strasse 37a D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | [1988/35] | Application number, filing date | 88102229.7 | 16.02.1988 | [1988/35] | Priority number, date | DE19873706009 | 25.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3706009 | DE19873731912 | 23.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3731912 | [1988/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0280156 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0280156 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0280156 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C231/00, C07C233/02, C07C233/16, C07C235/74, C07C303/40, C07C255/49, C07D213/75, C07D215/38, C07D217/22 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
C07C309/51 (EP);
C07C231/00 (KR);
C07C233/02 (EP);
C07C255/52 (EP);
C07C311/15 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/35] | C07C102/00, C07C103/375, C07C103/38, C07C103/46, C07C103/44, C07C143/78, C07C121/60, C07D213/75, C07D215/38, C07D217/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Acetoacetylarylamiden bzw. -heteroarylamiden desaktivierter Aromaten | [1988/35] | English: | Process for the preparation of acetoacetylarylamides-heteroarylamides respectively of deactived aromatic compounds | [1988/35] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'acétoacétylarylamides et également d'hétéroarylamides de composés aromatiques désactivés | [1988/35] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 23.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0053713 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [AD]GB715896 (DISTILLERS CO YEAST LTD); | [A]EP0004611 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]DE2519036 (HOECHST AG) | [A] - CHEMICAL PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, Band 29, Nr. 4, 1981, Seiten 1049-1055; H. YAMANAKA et al, "Studies on Quinoline and Isoquinoline Derivatives. VI. Addition Reaction of Diketene with Isoquinolines in the Presence of Carboxylic Acids" | [AD] - THE JOURNAL OF GENERAL CHEMISTRY OF THE USSR, Band 21, 1981, Seiten 1995-2000; V. V. PEREKALIN et al, "Reactions of ketene dimer; Reaction of ketene dimer with some weakly basic aromatic amines" |