EP0279438 - Process for the preparation of pure boron trifluoride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leutner, Bernd, Dr. Taunusstrasse 17 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Reich, Hans Heiner, Dr. Kranichstrasse 11 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1988/34] | Application number, filing date | 88102333.7 | 18.02.1988 | [1988/34] | Priority number, date | DE19873705283 | 19.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3705283 | [1988/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0279438 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0279438 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C01B35/06 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
C01B35/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1988/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von reinem Bortrifluorid | [1988/34] | English: | Process for the preparation of pure boron trifluoride | [1988/34] | French: | Procédé de préparation de trifluorure de bore pur | [1988/34] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 05.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1159911 [ ] (RIEDEL DE HAEN AG); | DE1667393 [ ] (BASF AG) |