EP0288678 - Oxidation resistant niobium alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Svedberg, Robert Carl 404 Simpson-Howell Road Elizabeth Pennsylvania 15037 / US | 02 /
Ammon, Robert Leroy 5406 Sagebrush Drive Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15236 / US | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Patentanwälte Schroeter-Fleuchaus-Lehmann & Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Fleuchaus & Wehser Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88102591.0 | 22.02.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | US19870044256 | 30.04.1987 Original published format: US 44256 | [1988/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0288678 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0288678 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/04, C22C27/02 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
C22C27/02 (EP,US);
C22C1/04 (KR);
C22C1/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/44] | Title | German: | Oxydationsbeständige Nioblegierung | [1988/44] | English: | Oxidation resistant niobium alloy | [1988/44] | French: | Alliage à base de niobium résistant à l'oxydation | [1988/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/48] | 29.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/11] | 06.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2505076 (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V); | [Y]US3723092 (BENJAMIN J); | [X]US3265472 (NESSLE GEORGE J, et al); | [A]US3231344 (BEAVER WALLACE W, et al) | [XP] - JOURNAL OF METALS, vol. 39, no. 7, July 1987, pages 22-26, Warrendale, PA, US; E.A. LORIA: "Niobium-base superalloys via powder metallurgy technology" |