EP0281042 - Multi-spectral imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIANT TECHSYSTEMS INC. 5901 Lincoln Drive Edina Minnesota 55436 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states ALLIANT TECHSYSTEMS INC. 5901 Lincoln Drive Edina, Minnesota 55436 / US | ||
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Droessler, Justin G. 8141 River View Terrace Fridley Minnesota 55432 / US | 02 /
Gill, George J. 220 Ash Street Waltham Massachusetts 02154 / US | [1988/36] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/45] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/36] | Rentzsch, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Kaiserleistrasse 39 Postfach 10 08 65 W-6050 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 88102947.4 | 27.02.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | US19870021858 | 04.03.1987 Original published format: US 21858 | [1988/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0281042 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0281042 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0281042 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q5/00 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
H01Q5/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/36] | Title | German: | Mehrbereich-Abbildungssystem | [1988/36] | English: | Multi-spectral imaging system | [1988/36] | French: | Système d'imagerie multispectrale | [1988/36] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 10.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2972743 (SVENSSON EMIL L, et al); | [A]US3114149 (JESSEN JR FREDERIC A); | [X]US3165749 (CUSHNER STANTON H); | [Y]US3235870 (HANNAN PETER W); | [A]US4477814 (BRUMBAUGH CHARLES T [US], et al); | [A]DE3436500 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) |