EP0324048 - Apparatus for removing condensate and the like from pressure systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIA Gesellschaft für Verfahrenstechnik mbH Heerdter Lohweg 63-71 D-40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [1989/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Werner Bockmühlstrasse 33 D-4050 Mönchengladbach 3 (Odenkirchen) / DE | 02 /
Frischmann, Werner Wilhelmshöhe 37 a D-5810 Witten-Stockum / DE | [1989/29] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gerd, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Müller, Gerd, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [1990/22] | Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [1989/29] | Stratmann, Ernst, Dr.-Ing. Schadowplatz 9 D-40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 88102974.8 | 29.02.1988 | [1989/29] | Priority number, date | DE19880000358U | 14.01.1988 Original published format: DE 8800358 U | [1989/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0324048 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0324048 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16T1/00 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
F16T1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ableiten von Kondensat und dgl. aus Drucksystemen | [1989/29] | English: | Apparatus for removing condensate and the like from pressure systems | [1989/29] | French: | Dispositif pour purger des condensats et similaires hors de systèmes sous pression | [1989/29] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 03.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Request for further processing for: | 08.05.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.05.1992 | ES | 13.05.1992 | GB | 13.05.1992 | GR | 13.05.1992 | IT | 13.05.1992 | NL | 13.05.1992 | SE | 13.05.1992 | FR | 02.10.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | BE | 13.05.1992 | |
GB | 13.05.1992 | ||
GR | 13.05.1992 | ||
IT | 13.05.1992 | ||
NL | 13.05.1992 | ||
SE | 13.05.1992 | ||
FR | 02.10.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 13.05.1992 | |
GB | 13.05.1992 | ||
IT | 13.05.1992 | ||
NL | 13.05.1992 | ||
SE | 13.05.1992 | ||
FR | 02.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/46] | BE | 13.05.1992 | |
GB | 13.05.1992 | ||
NL | 13.05.1992 | ||
SE | 13.05.1992 | ||
FR | 02.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | BE | 13.05.1992 | |
NL | 13.05.1992 | ||
SE | 13.05.1992 | ||
FR | 02.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | BE | 13.05.1992 | |
NL | 13.05.1992 | ||
SE | 13.05.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | NL | 13.05.1992 | |
SE | 13.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/52] | SE | 13.05.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3508229 (VIA GMBH [DE]) | [A] - MECHANICAL WORLD, Band 133, Februar 1953, Seiten 62-64, Manchester, GB; A.S. WADSWORTH: "Automatic drainage of compressed air systems" |