EP0281077 - Photoelectric conversion sensor for measuring particle size distribution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1993 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.1993 [1993/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagasu, Hideo National Aerospace Laboratory 44-1, Higashi-machi 7-chome Jindaiji Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | For all designated states TOHNICHI COMPUTER APPLICATIONS CO., LTD. 28-15, Shibuya 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states Nagasu, Hideo National Aerospace Laboratory 44-1, Higashi-machi 7-chome Jindaiji Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states TOHNICHI COMPUTER APPLICATIONS CO., LTD. 28-15, Shibuya 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Shigeru c/o Science & Technology Agency Nat. Aerospace Lab. 44-1, Higashi-machi 7-chome Jindaiji Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Saito, Takashi c/o Science & Technology Agency Nat. Aerospace Lab. 44-1, Higashi-machi 7-chome Jindaiji Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Horiuchi, Shoji c/o Science & Technology Agency Nat. Aerospace Lab. 44-1, Higashi-machi 7-chome Jindaiji Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Tadashi 3-16, Kami-Shakujii 1-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/36] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88103082.9 | 01.03.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | JP19870049776 | 04.03.1987 Original published format: JP 4977687 | [1988/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0281077 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0281077 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/02, H01L31/02 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
H01L31/035272 (EP,US);
G01N15/0211 (EP,US);
H01L31/02024 (EP,US);
G01N2021/4716 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/36] | Title | German: | Photoelektrischer Konversionsdetektor zur Messung der Partikelgrössenverteilung | [1988/36] | English: | Photoelectric conversion sensor for measuring particle size distribution | [1988/36] | French: | Détecteur par conversion photo-électrique pour mesurer la répartition de dimensions particulaires | [1988/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 28.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/36] | 13.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0207176 (FRITSCH GMBH [DE]); | [X]US4274741 (CORNILLAULT JEAN) |