EP0319635 - Liquid crystal television [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 9-13, Nakameguro 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 9-13, Nakameguro 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiyama, Ryoichi c/o Kajigayaso 206 19-1 Suenaga Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Andrae/Flach/Haug/Kneissl Prinzregentenstrasse 24 D-83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 88103083.7 | 01.03.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | JP19870305541 | 04.12.1987 Original published format: JP 30554187 | [1989/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0319635 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319635 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/12, G09G3/36 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
H04N3/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/24] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallfernsehen | [1989/24] | English: | Liquid crystal television | [1989/24] | French: | Télévision à cristaux liquides | [1989/24] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 17.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2149181 (SHARP KK); | [A]EP0194315 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0241562 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |