EP0281902 - Bis-naphthalimides, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNOLL AG Postfach 21 08 05 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states KNOLL AG Postfach 21 08 05 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fernandez Brana, Miguel, Dr. Avenida de Burgos Nr. 20,10 M. ES-28036 Madrid / ES | 02 /
Castellano Berlanga, José Maria, Dr. Avenida de Burgos Nr. 20,3 M. ES-28036 Madrid / ES | 03 /
Keilhauer, Gerhard, Dr. Industriestrasse 20 D-6701 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | 04 /
Schlick, Erich, Dr. Rudolph-Wihr-Strasse 4 1/2 D-6708 Neuhofen / DE | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Karau, Wolfgang, et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | Karau, Wolfgang, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88103097.7 | 02.03.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | DE19873707651 | 10.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3707651 | [1988/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0281902 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0281902 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D221/14, A61K31/435 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
C07D221/14 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/37] | Title | German: | Bis-naphthalimide, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1988/37] | English: | Bis-naphthalimides, their preparation and use | [1988/37] | French: | Bis-naphtalimides, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1988/37] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/41] | 31.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2823987 [ ] (MADE LABOR SA); | US4499266 [ ] (CHENG CHIA C [US], et al) |