EP0282811 - 4-Cyano-1-aryl-pyrazoles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1989 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.03.1989 [1989/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehring, Reinhold, Dr. Dasnöckel 49 D-5600 Wuppertal 11 / DE | 02 /
Schallner, Otto, Dr. Noldeweg 22 D-4019 Monheim / DE | 03 /
Stetter, Jörg, Dr. Gellertweg 4 D-5600 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
Santel, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Grünstrasse 9a D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 05 /
Schmidt, Robert R., Dr. Im Waldwinkel 110 D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | [1988/38] | Application number, filing date | 88103123.1 | 02.03.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | DE19873707686 | 11.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3707686 | [1988/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282811 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/04, C07D401/04, A01N43/56, // C07D231/40 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP);
A01N43/56 (EP);
A01N47/02 (EP);
C07D403/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/38] | Title | German: | 4-Cyano-1-aryl-pyrazole | [1988/38] | English: | 4-Cyano-1-aryl-pyrazoles | [1988/38] | French: | 4-Cyano-1-aryl-pyrazoles | [1988/38] | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 02.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 25.01.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2123420 ; | [Y]DE3426424 ; | [A]GB2101999 ; | [A]GB2136427 ; | [A]EP0205021 |