EP0302165 - Process for the encapsulation of both microelectronic semiconductor and thick or thin film circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung D-81663 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möller, Werner, Dr. Ravensburger Strasse 77 D-7900 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Ulmann, Andreas Grimmstrasse 1 D-7318 Lenningen / DE | [1989/06] | Application number, filing date | 88103232.0 | 03.03.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | DE19873725269 | 30.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3725269 | [1989/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302165 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0302165 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/56, H01L23/29, H01L23/31 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
H01L21/56 (EP,US);
H01L23/16 (EP,US);
H01L23/3121 (EP,US);
H01L23/3135 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0102 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01046 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1517 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16152 (EP,US);
Y10S228/904 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49146 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49162 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53178 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [1989/06] | H01L21/56, H01L23/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einkapseln von mikroelektronischen Halbleiter- und Schichtschaltungen | [1989/06] | English: | Process for the encapsulation of both microelectronic semiconductor and thick or thin film circuits | [1989/06] | French: | Procédé d'encapsulation de circuit microélectroniques semi-conducteurs et de couches minces ou épaisses | [1989/06] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/12] | 27.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.10.1991 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3442131 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | [A]EP0122687 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) |