EP0284809 - Method for transmitting radio signals and transmission system for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roll, Hans Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Ringstrasse 10 D-7901 Illerkirchberg / DE | [1988/40] | Representative(s) | Amersbach, Werner, et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | Amersbach, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 88103247.8 | 03.03.1988 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | DE19873710455 | 30.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3710455 | [1988/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0284809 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0284809 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00 | [1988/40] | CPC: |
H04B5/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung von Funksignalen und Funkübertragungssystem zur Ausführung des Verfahrens | [1988/40] | English: | Method for transmitting radio signals and transmission system for carrying out the method | [1988/40] | French: | Procédé de transmission de signaux radio et système de transmission pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [1988/40] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2645057 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]DE2754455 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]EP0004003 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]CH651432 (AUTOPHON AG) |