EP0282868 - Spool valve with lever actuation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEILMEIER & WEINLEIN Fabrik für Oel-Hydraulik GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 80 08 04 D-81608 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states HEILMEIER & WEINLEIN Fabrik für Oel-Hydraulik GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 80 08 04 D-81608 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunner, Rudolf Wankstrasse 23 D-8011 Baldham / DE | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/38] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88103533.1 | 07.03.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | DE19873709151 | 20.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3709151 | [1988/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0282868 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0282868 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282868 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/48, F16K31/52, F16K3/24 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
F16K27/02 (EP);
F16K31/44 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/38] | F16K3/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/38] | Title | German: | Steuerschieber mit Hebelbetätigung | [1988/38] | English: | Spool valve with lever actuation | [1988/38] | French: | Tiroir de distribution avec commande à levier | [1988/38] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/43] | 02.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1249042 ; | [A]US1384670 (BARRIE ARTURO MUNDER Y); | [A]US2014759 (CLAY OLLIE C); | [A]US2347676 (EPLETT ALBERT D); | [A]FR968477 ; | [A]US3656710 (SHAW HARRY N); | [AD]DE3000085 (HEILMEIER & WEINLEIN [DE]) |