Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3871418D1 | 02.07.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3871418 | 08.03.1988 | DE8705322 | 10.04.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0285832 | Global Dossier | 27.05.1992 | B1 | EP0285832 | 26.07.1989 | A3 | EP0285832 | 12.10.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE8705322 | 10.04.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE8705322U | 13.08.1987 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE8705322 | 10.04.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2031942T | 01.01.1993 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE8705322 | 10.04.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4952551 | 28.08.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE8705322 | 10.04.1987 |