EP0285832 - Manifolding assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler, Walter Edelweissring 38 D-8901 Königsbrunn / DE | [1988/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Kirschner & Grosse Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Patentanwälte Kirschner & Grosse Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88103640.4 | 08.03.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | DE19870005322U | 10.04.1987 Original published format: DE 8705322 U | [1988/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0285832 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0285832 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0285832 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41L1/36, B41M5/124 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
B41L1/22 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/29] | B41L1/36, B41M5/12, B41M5/10, B41M5/22 | ||
Former IPC [1988/41] | B41L1/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/41] | Title | German: | Durchschreibeformularsatz | [1988/41] | English: | Manifolding assembly | [1988/41] | French: | Assemblage de formules autographiques | [1988/41] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 19.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP56051383 ; | [Y]US3011905 (NEWMAN DOUGLAS A); | [X]US3314814 (NEWMAN DOUGLAS A); | [Y]FR2239858 (KORES SA [FR]); | [Y]FR2350208 (MEAD CORP [US]); | [E]FR2604951 (ECONO MAILER LTD [GB]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 108 (M-78) 780 14 Juli 1981, & JP-A-56 051 383 (NAGAI KAABONINKI K.K.) 08 Mai 1981., & JP56051383 A 00000000 |