EP0282019 - Transparent thermoplastic moulding compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wieners, Gerhard, Dr. Unterweg 17 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
Heumüller, Rudolf, Dr. Sodener Weg 1 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | 03 /
Coutandin, Jochen, Dr. Friedenstrasse 3 D-6551 Bretzenheim / DE | 04 /
Groh, Werner, Dr. Geisenheimer Strasse 93 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 71 / DE | 05 /
Herbrechtsmeier, Peter, Dr. Friedrich-Stolze-Strasse 10 D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | [1988/37] | Application number, filing date | 88103683.4 | 09.03.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | DE19873707923 | 12.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3707923 | [1988/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0282019 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0282019 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/18, G02B1/04 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
G02B6/02033 (EP);
C08F20/22 (EP);
G02B1/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/04, C08L33/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/37] | Title | German: | Transparente thermoplastische Formmasse | [1988/37] | English: | Transparent thermoplastic moulding compounds | [1988/37] | French: | Masses de moulage thermoplastiques transparentes | [1988/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 29.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/45] | Request for further processing for: | 10.09.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 10.09.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3143535 ; | [AD]US3022277 |