Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.09.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] |
24.01.1992 | First examination report | |
26.10.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] |
30.01.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 21.03.1990 [1990/12] |
30.07.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.09.1988 [1988/37] |