EP0282916 - Water storage heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viessmann, Hans, Dr. Schlossstrasse 3 95030 Hof/Saale / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states Viessmann, Hans, Dr. Schlossstrasse 3 D-95030 Hof/Saale / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 Postfach 700245 63427 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1988/38] | Wolf, Günter, Dipl.Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Amthor, Dipl.-Ing. Wolf, Postfach 70 02 45 D-63427 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 88103844.2 | 11.03.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | DE19870003893U | 16.03.1987 Original published format: DE 8703893 U | DE19880001491U | 06.02.1988 Original published format: DE 8801491 U | [1988/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0282916 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0282916 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282916 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/22, F24H9/12 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
F24H1/50 (EP);
F24H9/13 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/38] | F24H9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/38] | Title | German: | Brauchwasserspeicher | [1988/38] | English: | Water storage heater | [1988/38] | French: | Appareil de chauffage à accumulation d'eau | [1988/38] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 25.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1944049U (GANHOER WILHELM [DE]); | [A]DE7031491U (JUNKERS & CO [DE]); | [YD]DE8703893U |