EP0285860 - Electrical connectors and clip and methods of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BURNDY CORPORATION Richards Avenue Box 5200 Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states BURNDY CORPORATION Richards Avenue Box 5200 Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noschese, Rocco 35, Wilton Wood Wilton, CT 06897 / US | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Fincke, Karl Theodor, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104008.3 | 14.03.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | US19870037047 | 10.04.1987 Original published format: US 37047 | [1988/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0285860 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0285860 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/514 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
H01R13/6275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/41] | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbinder und Klammer und Anwendungsmethoden | [1988/41] | English: | Electrical connectors and clip and methods of use | [1988/41] | French: | Connecteurs électriques et clip et méthodes d'utilisation | [1988/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 10.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/26] | 27.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3852703 (CARNEY W, et al); | [A]US3920309 (GARVER WILLIAM JOSEPH); | [A]US4621885 (SZCZESNY DAVID S [US], et al) |